Mussari, Benedetto (CPSO#: 65429)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2301
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

166 Brock St
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3310 Ext. 3020
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

776 Blackburn Mews
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Canada
Phone: (613) 384-5488
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

B3-835 Princess St
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-8775
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ben Mussari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Mussari ( CPSO# 65429 )

Business Address:
835 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-8775

Business Address:
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2301

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7L 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220


Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, McCallum, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rumbolt ( CPSO# 93048 )
Dr. D. Dabreo ( CPSO# 93188 )
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 84503 )
Dr. X. Wang ( CPSO# 86450 )
Dr. R. Butler ( CPSO# 86184 )
Dr. F. Cheeseman ( CPSO# 59183 )
Dr. C. Abraham ( CPSO# 70151 )
Dr. S. Grahovac ( CPSO# 54394 )
Dr. D. Jabs ( CPSO# 70253 )
Dr. J. Flood ( CPSO# 81434 )
Dr. A. McCallum ( CPSO# 63659 )
Dr. A. Menard ( CPSO# 79021 )
Dr. D. Soboleski ( CPSO# 59427 )
Dr. D. Walker ( CPSO# 33831 )
Dr. O. Islam ( CPSO# 69179 )
Dr. P. Fenton ( CPSO# 54474 )
Dr. B. Mussari ( CPSO# 65429 )
Dr. J. Ricketts ( CPSO# 66593 )
Dr. C. Scott ( CPSO# 79597 )
Dr. E. Sauerbrei ( CPSO# 28818 )
Dr. I. Silver ( CPSO# 79178 )

Business Address:
191 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 8A6
Phone Number: (613) 548-4417

Business Address:
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Business Address:
835 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-8775

Business Address:
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
HDH
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
SMOL 752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENEDETTO MUSSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSSARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1993