Musson, Robert Scott (CPSO#: 59395)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 15 May 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 May 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1990
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2000
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 15 May 2001

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 May 2001
Summary:

 On May 14, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Musson guilty of professional misconduct with 
 respect to:  sexual abuse; sexual impropriety; failure to maintain the standard of practice of the 
 profession; falsifying a record; charging fees for services not performed; prescribing, 
 dispensing, or selling drugs for an improper purpose; engaging in conduct or an act relevant to 
 the practice of medicine that would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional; and, incompetence. 

The Committee ordered the following 
 penalty:

(1) recorded reprimand;
(2) revocation;
(3) $15,000 in costs awarded to the College; 
 and,
(4) that Dr. Musson reimburse the College for funding paid by the College to named patients 
 for therapy and counselling pursuant to the provision of the Health Professions Procedural Code.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 14, 2001