Mustard, John Charles (CPSO#: 55995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Gateway Community Health Centre
Bag 99
41 McClellan Street
Tweed ON  K0K 3J0
Phone: (613) 478-1211
Fax: (613) 478-1220
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

415 River Street
Tweed ON  K0K 3J0
Canada
Phone: (613) 478-5524
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Suite B
R R 3
124 Old Troy Road
Tweed ON  K0K 3J0
Canada
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles Mustard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mustard ( CPSO# 55995 )

Business Address:
415 River Street
Tweed ON  K0K 3J0
Phone Number: (613) 478-5524

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN CHARLES MUSTARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSTARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1985