Mustata, Stefan (CPSO#: 67584)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Bucharest, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Oct 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 03 Oct 1994
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2005