Mutch, Linsey Shelagh (CPSO#: 79022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
400 McKeown Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 0B2
Phone: (705) 495-8115
Fax: (705) 495-8114
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linsey S. Mutch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mutch ( CPSO# 79022 )

Business Address:
400 McKeown Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 0B2
Phone Number: (705) 495-8135

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-7525

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINSEY SHELAGH MUTCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUTCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007