Muthalaly, Koshy (CPSO#: 79822)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Sep 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Health Centenary Site
Department of Paediatrics
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7103
Fax: (416) 281-7490
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Koshy Muthalaly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Muthalaly ( CPSO# 79822 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7103

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Sep 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 23 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 May 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 May 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Koshy  Muthalaly  may  practice  medicine  independently in hospital based
            Paediatrics, only.