Muthusami, Prakash (CPSO#: 101682)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Nov 2016

Expiry Date:  20 Nov 2023

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Nov 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jawaharlal Inst Postgraduate Med Educ, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 21 Nov 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Sep 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Nov 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Nov 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Nov 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Prakash Muthusami may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging,  University  of  Toronto,  in which Dr. Muthusami holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Muthusami  no longer holds the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating  that Dr. Muthusami's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not receive an annual report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee  makes   a   decision  about  Dr.  Muthusami's
                        certificate  of  registration,  following   consideration   of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  November 21, 2016.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate  will,  if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on November 20, 2023.