Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Mutukistna, Indren (CPSO#: 59858)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Richpoint Medical Centre
10815 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3E3
Phone: (905) 770-3004
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mutukistna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Soong ( CPSO# 59653 )
Dr. I. Mutukistna ( CPSO# 59858 )

Business Address:
Richpoint Medical Centre
10815 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3E3
Phone Number: (905) 770-3004

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INDREN MUTUKISTNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUTUKISTNA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1989