Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Muul, Arnold Heiti (CPSO#: 52346)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian, French

Education:Queen's University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 1990