Muzaffer, Mohammed Ahmed (CPSO#: 63263)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Apr 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Apr 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1983

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 23 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 22 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Apr 1997