Myckan, Kerry Alina (CPSO#: 76395)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: Wilson, Kerry Alina (used until: 08 Dec 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 502
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 820-8748
Fax: (905) 820-0255
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Myckan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Myckan ( CPSO# 76395 )

Business Address:
Suite 502
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 820-8748

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KERRY ALINA MYCKAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYCKAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006