Mycyk, Taras Roman (CPSO#: 31244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal University Hospital
Cardiovascular Surgery
103 Hospital Drive
Saskatoon SK  S7N 0W8
Phone: (306) 844-1383
Fax: (306) 966-6932

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARAS ROMAN MYCYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYCYK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1985