Myers, Andrew Brian (CPSO#: 61041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 433-4305
Fax: (905) 721-4770
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Levine Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rastogi ( CPSO# 68153 )
Dr. A. Myers ( CPSO# 61041 )
Dr. V. Massaad ( CPSO# 75329 )
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 78178 )
Dr. G. Lacey ( CPSO# 67159 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 81024 )
Dr. N. Isaac ( CPSO# 71092 )
Dr. G. Dotsikas ( CPSO# 66718 )
Dr. G. Donsky ( CPSO# 73822 )
Dr. M. Asch ( CPSO# 52679 )
Dr. W. Wei ( CPSO# 86891 )
Dr. A. Raikhlin ( CPSO# 86803 )
Dr. S. Galante ( CPSO# 98914 )

Business Address:
King Street X-Ray & Ultrasound
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-7702

Business Address:
Bowmanville X-Ray & Ultrasound
1101 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-2727

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Baywood X-Ray & Ultrasound
Baywood Medical Clinic
101 - 95 Bayly Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-0444


Corporation Name: Andy Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Turk ( CPSO# 59317 )
Dr. A. Myers ( CPSO# 61041 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health - Bowmanville Site
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health - Port Perry Site
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-7321

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW BRIAN MYERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1990