Myers, Jeffrey Adam (CPSO#: 75067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5135
Fax: (905) 813-4024
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Adam Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Myers ( CPSO# 75067 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 31 Dec 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY ADAM MYERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2005