Myers, Jeffrey William (CPSO#: 69166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite H336
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7255
Fax: (416) 480-5146
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Myers ( CPSO# 69166 )

Business Address:
Sinai Health System - Bridgepoint
1 Bridgepoint Drive
PCU - 4th Floor North
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 470-6690

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY WILLIAM MYERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2005