Myers, Kathryn Ann (CPSO#: 58160)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 646-6142
Fax: (519) 663-3291
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farquhar Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Myers ( CPSO# 58160 )
Dr. D. Farquhar ( CPSO# 50526 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6227

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 646-6142

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN ANN MYERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993