Myers, Robert Bernard Hudson (CPSO#: 59746)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre.
Division of Cardiology
Room A217
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4746
Fax: (416) 480-5251
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

KMH Cardiology & Diagnostic Inc
Suite #5
1310 Don Mills Road
Toronto ON  M3B 2W6
Canada
Phone: (905) 855-1860 Ext. 241
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

LP Cardiology
3080 Yonge Street #4076
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Canada
Phone: 647 347 6644
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Myers ( CPSO# 59746 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook and Women's College
Health Sciences Centre
Division of Cardiology - Room A217
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4746

Business Address:
KMH Cardiology and Diagnostics Inc.
5 - 1310 Don Mills Road
North York ON  M3B 2W6
Phone Number: (416) 781-3904

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT BERNARD HUDSON MYERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1990