Myles, Virginia Jane (CPSO#: 62709)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Groupe Medical Ste Catherine
Suite 660
5025 Sherbrooke Street West
Westmount QC  H4A 1S9
Phone: (514) 932-6122
Fax: (514) 933-8739

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIRGINIA JANE MYLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYLES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1991