Myles, Wellington Michael (CPSO#: 59025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Dec 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Centrepointe Drive
Suite 211
Nepean ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 226-8872
Fax: (613) 226-3557
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3rd Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 738-8537
Fax: (613) 738-8394
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

407 Laurier Ave West
Ottawa ON  K1R 7Y7
Canada
Phone: (613) 288-2020
Fax: (613) 232-2669
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W.M. Myles Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Myles ( CPSO# 59025 )

Business Address:
211 - 1 Centrepointe Drive
Nepean ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 226-8872

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-7100

Business Address:
407 Laurier Avenue West
Ottawa ON  K1R 7Y7
Phone Number: (613) 232-2655

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 10 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WELLINGTON MICHAEL MYLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYLES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Nov 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 May 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1988