Mylvaganam, Rock Rajasothy Xavier (CPSO#: 64893)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Apr 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese, Tamil

Education:University of Colombo, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
278 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V4
Phone: (613) 233-1565
Fax: (613) 233-1851
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rock Mylvaganam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mylvaganam ( CPSO# 64893 )

Business Address:
278 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V4
Phone Number: (613) 233-1565

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROCK RAJASOTHY XAVIER MYLVAGANAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYLVAGANAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2017