Mymko, Morris (CPSO#: 24828)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Morris Mymko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Fort William Health Network 117 McKellar Street South Thunder Bay, Ontario P7E 1H5 Tel: (807) 626-1234 Fax: (807) 623-8832
Date Received: 20 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013