Mysore, Munithanamma Jayaram (CPSO#: 55915)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada

Education:Mysore Medical College, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2011