Mysore, Suresh Malliah (CPSO#: 55122)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mysore University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 2011