First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Sep 2022 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Nov 2022 |