Nabavi, Mitra (CPSO#: 81726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pathology Department
381 church street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905)472-7591 Ext. 6681
Fax: (905) 721-4757
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nabavi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nabavi ( CPSO# 81726 )

Business Address:
Laboratory Services
P O Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (647) 992-0578

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MITRA NABAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NABAVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2009