Nabwangu, James Francis (CPSO#: 25595)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 26 Oct 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Oct 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Swahili

Education:The Johns Hopkins University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 14 Mar 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993