Nacpil, Alicia (CPSO#: 64001)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 30 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Oct 1997