Nadarajah, Jayanthini (CPSO#: 91913)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Nadarajah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nadarajah ( CPSO# 91913 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAYANTHINI NADARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADARAJAH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2015