Nadarajah, Senthilraj (CPSO#: 99068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Jul 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Jaffna, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Electoral District: 03

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jul 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 Jan 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Aug 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Senthilraj  Nadarajah  may  practise  medicine  independently  in internal
            medicine, only.