Nadeau, Gary John Michael (CPSO#: 58495)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2011


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. GARY JOHN MICHAEL NADEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2011