Nadeau, Genevieve (CPSO#: 97635)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Laval University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 29 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Jul 2012
Elective Trainee - Urology

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2013