Nadeau, Johane (CPSO#: 77643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: Nadeau, Johane Murielle (used until: 23 Jun 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6001
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Johane Nadeau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nadeau ( CPSO# 77643 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Department of Geriatric Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group,Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHANE NADEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 02 Jul 2007 to 21 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007