Nadel, Helen Ruth (CPSO#: 31228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology
British Columbia Children's Hosp
4480 Oak Street
Vancouver BC  V6H 3V4
Phone: (604) 875-3034
Fax: (604) 875-2367

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELEN RUTH NADEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1998