Nadi, Mustafa Moh'd Y (CPSO#: 93923)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Mosul, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 16 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014