Nadkarni, Dipti Ashok (CPSO#: 76139)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 221
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 4M4
Phone: (613) 935-3746
Fax: (613) 935-3694
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dipti Nadkarni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nadkarni ( CPSO# 76139 )

Business Address:
221 - 820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5R5
Phone Number: (613) 935-3746

Business Address:
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 20 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIPTI ASHOK NADKARNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADKARNI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 08 Jan 2009 to 31 May 2009
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009