Nadon, Dominique J (CPSO#: 58539)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 May 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Health Services
Suite 302
1 Nicholas Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1N 7B7
Phone: (613) 564-3950 Ext. 296
Fax: (613) 564-6627
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Nipissing General hospital
725 chemin Coursol
Sturgeons Falls Ontario
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Canada
Phone: 705-753-2271
Fax: 705-753-4202
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 23 May 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 23 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 23, 2017, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Dominique J Nadon in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Nadon has given to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                         DR. DOMINIQUE J NADON
                                             ("Dr. Nadon")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Nadon, certificate of registration number 58539, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that two patient complaints against me led to
                  the investigations bearing File Numbers 100849 and Number 101813 (the
                  "Investigations").

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in: Understanding
                              Boundaries and Managing the Risks Inherent in the
                              Doctor-Patient Relationship.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it and of the
                        certificate being made available to me by the course provider. I
                        acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole
                        discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional
                        Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to complete this requirement within six
                        months of entering into this undertaking or, if no satisfactory
                        program is available by that time, by the first possible
                        opportunity thereafter.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (6)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (7)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (8)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (9)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (10)  I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (11)  I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (12)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (12)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Further to the receipt of two complaints, College
                              investigations were conducted into Dr. Nadon's standard of
                              practice. As a result of the investigations:
                  
                                    *     Dr. Nadon will engage in professional education
                                          in maintaining appropriate boundaries with
                                          patients.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Nadon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Nadon, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking and
                  
                  (b)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  
            As from February 3, 2017, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Dominique J Nadon, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Nadon has given to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                          DR. DOMINIQUE NADON
                                             ("Dr. Nadon")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Nadon, certificate of registration number 58539, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that the College initiated investigations
                  bearing File Numbers 99420 and 101092 (the "Investigations") into my
                  standard of practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              three months, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my
                        Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report(s) of the medical inspector dated August 12, 2016, and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Nadon, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine in Ontario until such
                        time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the
                        College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Nadon, agree that if I am required to cease practise in
                        Ontario as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Nadon, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (6)(c) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Nadon, hereby consent to any of the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (6)(c) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Nadon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (13) above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Nadon was the subject of a College investigation into his
                              standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr. Nadon will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6
                                    months. 
                              *     Dr. Nadon's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within 6 months of the end of
                                    the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Nadon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Nadon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Nadon, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors,
                  Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one
                  another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  
                  
            As from May 9, 2016, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Dominique J Nadon, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Nadon has given to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                         DR. DOMINIQUE J NADON
                                             ("Dr. Nadon")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Nadon, certificate of registration number 58539, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that I am currently the subject of a College
                  investigation bearing File Number 7214830 (the "Investigation") into
                  concerns about my prescribing practices.

            (4)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that, upon receiving an original copy of this
                  Undertaking as signed by me, the College has agreed to take no further
                  action on the Investigation.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 


            (6)   Resignation of Prescribing Privileges   

                  (a)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake and agree that I will not issue new
                        prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the
                        following substances:
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19); 
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Appendix "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Appendix "B")
                  
                        (iii) List of Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in
                              Appendix "C") and as amended from time to time.
                  
            (7)   Posting a Sign 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake that I shall post a sign in the waiting
                        room(s) of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and
                        secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "D."  For further
                        clarity, this sign shall state as follows: 
                  
                                           IMPORTANT NOTICE

                          Dr. Nadon does not prescribe any of the following: 
                                            -Narcotic Drugs
                                        -Narcotic Preparations
                                           -Monitored drugs

            Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
            Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

                  (b)   I, Dr. Nadon, currently provide services in English and in French.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to post a French translation of the sign
                        described in section (7)(a) above, in the waiting room(s) of all my
                        Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in
                        the form set out at Appendix "D." 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to provide the French translation described
                        in section (7)(c), to the College within thirty (30) days of
                        executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to provide to the College a certified
                        translation(s) of the sign described in section 7(a) prior to
                        beginning to provide services in the language(s) described in
                        section (7)(e).
                  
            (8)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for six months (6) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "E", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "F";
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts once every
                              month;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me once every month;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              three months, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "F" to my
                        Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report(s) of the medical inspector dated January 15 and January 29,
                        2016, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "E" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to ensure that Appendix "E" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "E" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Nadon, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (8)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Nadon, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (8)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (9)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)    a program(s) satisfactory to the College in:
                              Psychopharmacology; 
                        (ii)   all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "F"; and
                        (iii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical  Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (9)(a) as soon as the certificate becomes available.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        professional education set out in section (9)(a).
                  
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to complete this requirement by December
                        2016 or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (10)  Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (8)
                        above and Appendix "E" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, an
                        interview, direct observation of my care, interviews with
                        colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other
                        tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking and to abide by those
                        recommendations. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Nadon, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (10)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Nadon, hereby consent to any of the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (10)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (11)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Nadon, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Nadon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
            (d)   I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP: and NMS consent
                  form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "G" and Appendix "H", respectively. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Nadon, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (15)  I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (16)  I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (17)  I, Dr. Nadon, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                  Dr. Nadon was the subject of a College investigation into his prescribing
                  practice. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                        *     Dr. Nadon relinquished prescribing narcotic drugs, narcotic
                              preparations and monitored drugs.
                        *     Dr. Nadon will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months. 
                        *     Dr. Nadon will engage in professional education in
                              Polypharmacology.
                        *     Dr. Nadon's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Nadon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (9) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Nadon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any
                  information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering
                  into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Nadon, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in section (9) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "E";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (9) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 23, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dominique J Nadon to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 23, 2017:

Further to the receipt of two complaints, College investigations were conducted into Dr. Nadon’s standard of practice. As a result of the investigations:

• Dr. Nadon will engage in professional education in maintaining appropriate boundaries with patients.


Source: Member
Active Date: February 3, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dominique J Nadon to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 3, 2017:

Dr. Nadon was the subject of a College investigation into his standard of practice. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Nadon will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.
• Dr. Nadon’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: Member
Active Date: May 9, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dominique J Nadon to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 9, 2016:

Dr. Nadon was the subject of a College investigation into his prescribing practice. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Nadon relinquished prescribing narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations and monitored drugs.
• Dr. Nadon will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.
• Dr. Nadon will engage in professional education in Polypharmacology.
• Dr. Nadon’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.