Nadon, Fernand Gaston Vincent (CPSO#: 57720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1986

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Of Ottawa
Health Services
100 Marie Curie, Suite 300
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vincent Nadon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Nadon ( CPSO# 57720 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa
Health Services
300 - 100 Marie Curie Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FERNAND GASTON VINCENT NADON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1986

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 23, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:

Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that Vincent NADON

(1) on or about January 16, 2018 at the City of Ottawa did, without lawful excuse, surreptitiously make a visual recording of a person who was in circumstances that gave rise to a reasonable expectation of privacy when that person was in a place in which that person could reasonably be expected to be nude, to be exposing his or her genital organs or anal region or exposing her breasts or be engaged in explicit sexual activity, namely a Doctor’s office examination room located at 316 Rideau Street, and thereby commit an offence under Section 162(1)(a) of the Criminal Code, contrary to Section 162(5) of the Criminal Code of Canada; and

(2) contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada, did sexually assault at the City of Ottawa:

1. AA on or about January 16, 2018;
2. BB between January 1, 1999 and December 31, 2004;
3. CC on or about January 13, 2015;
4. DD on or about May 26, 2015;
5. EE between January 1, 2000 and January 8, 2011;
6. FF on or about May 10, 2013;
7. GG on or about June 2, 1999;
8. HH on or about September 6, 2016;
9. II on or about September 5, 2012;
10. JJ on or about May 31, 2017; and
11. KK on or about May 16, 2017.

Date of charges: February 21, 2018
Place of charges: Ottawa, ON
Ottawa Police Service


Source: Member
Active Date: February 23, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require members to report to the College any currently existing conditions of release (“bail conditions”) following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal. The following are conditions of release made against this member that relate to this member’s practice of medicine:

[February 21, 2018]
-Do not associate or communicate in any way either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with individuals specified in the Recognizance of Bail, or any member of the University of Ottawa Health Services or any past or present patient of his (except with regards to members of the University of Ottawa Health Services, and only through legal counsel or the Director of the University of Ottawa Health Services for the purpose of completing outstanding files).
-Do not attend the campus of the University of Ottawa.
-Not to seek, obtain or continue any employment or volunteer work where he would be conducting examinations or procedures, medical or otherwise.
-To have no contact with any patients, for any purpose.


Source: Member
Active Date: January 25, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:

Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that Vincent NADON

(1) on or about January 16, 2018 at the City of Ottawa did, without lawful excuse, surreptitiously make a visual recording of a person who was in circumstances that gave rise to a reasonable expectation of privacy when that person was in a place in which that person could reasonably be expected to be nude, to be exposing his or her genital organs or anal region or exposing her breasts or be engaged in explicit sexual activity, namely a Doctor’s office examination room located at 316 Rideau Street, and thereby commit an offence under Section 162(1)(a) of the Criminal Code, contrary to Section 162(5) of the Criminal Code of Canada; and

(2) on or about January 16, 2018 at the City of Ottawa did commit a sexual assault on XX, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charges: January 18, 2018
Place of charges: Ottawa, ON
Ottawa Police Service


Source: Member
Active Date: January 18, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require members to report to the College any currently existing conditions of release (“bail conditions”) following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal. The following are conditions of release made against this member that relate to this member’s practice of medicine:

[January 23, 2018]
-Do not to contact or communicate in any way either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with individuals specified in the Recognizance of Bail, or any past or present patient, or any member of the University of Ottawa Health Services (except through legal counsel and the Director (or designate) for the purposes of completing outstanding files).
-Do not attend the University of Ottawa.
-Not to seek, obtain or continue any employment where he would be conducting examinations or procedures, medical or otherwise.