Naehrig, Susanne (CPSO#: 88288)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:George August Univ of Gottingen, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 May 2008 to 23 Jun 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2008