Naert, Karen Anne (CPSO#: 94952)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2011 to 06 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2012 to 18 Nov 2012
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2014