Nag, Sukriti (CPSO#: 31080)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Lucknow, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Pathology, Rm 542 Jelke
Rush Univ Med Center
1750 W Harrison Avenue
Chicago IL  60612
United States
Phone: (312) 942-5260
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Jelke 10th Floor, Rm 1020S
Rush Univ Med Center
1750 W Harrison Street
Chicago IL  60612
United States
Phone: (312) 942-2269
Fax: (312) 942-2297
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 05 Apr 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUKRITI NAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1979