Nagahara, Brian Mitsuo (CPSO#: 59955)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 1990

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Doctor's Office
9625 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5T2
Phone: (905) 508-4114
Fax: (905) 508-4116
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Uptown Health Centre
8-9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8
Canada
Phone: (905) 508-8876
Fax: (905) 508-1087
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN MITSUO NAGAHARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGAHARA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1990
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 03 Jun 1996
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 31 Aug 1996

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 May 1996
Summary:

 In May 1996, Dr. Nagahara pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 61(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1990, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an 
 offence relevant to his suitability to practice.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and 
 found Dr. Nagahara guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee imposed the 
 following penalty:

1.	Dr. Nagahara was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be 
 recorded on the Register.

2.	Dr. Nagahara(s licence to practice was to be suspended for a period 
 of ninety days.

3.	Upon completion of the period of suspension, the following terms, conditions 
 and limitations were to be placed on Dr. Nagahara(s licence:

(a)	Dr. Nagahara was to continue to 
 attend his treating psychiatrist or another psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar, as 
 frequently as the treating psychiatrist or his substitute deemed necessary, for a minimum of two 
 years from the date upon which this Order became final, or such longer period as the treating 
 psychiatrist or his substitute deemed necessary.  Dr. Nagahara was to ensure that the treating 
 psychiatrist or his substitute submitted a report satisfactory to the Registrar every six months, 
 commencing 180 days after the date upon which this Order became final, confirming compliance by 
 Dr. Nagahara with this condition.

(b)	Dr. Nagahara was to have a third party present for any 
 general physical examination of a female patient that included a breast, pelvic or rectal 
 examination.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 21, 1996