Nagai, Gordon Raymond (CPSO#: 42798)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 1984


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 10
78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Phone: (416) 279-0855 Ext. 245
Fax: (416) 279-0857
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. GORDON RAYMOND NAGAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGAI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1984