Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Nagai, Ryuta (CPSO#: 57100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6
100 Martindale Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 2Y3
Phone: (905) 684-6529
Fax: (905) 684-5577
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nagai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nagai ( CPSO# 57100 )

Business Address:
6 - 100 Martindale Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 2Y3
Phone Number: (905) 684-6529

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 03 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYUTA NAGAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1987