Naganobu, Edward Roland (CPSO#: 23244)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.R. Naganobu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 21 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: 160 Dundurn Street South Hamilton, ON L8P 4K3
Date Received: 23 Apr 2014


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. P.C. Chu Dundurn Medical Group 160 Dundurn Street South Hamilton, Ontario L8P 4K3 Tel: (905) 528-5480 Fax: (905) 389-1104
Date Received: 04 Jun 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014