Nagari Nandieshwar, Satyadev (CPSO#: 102268)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Feb 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Telugu

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Forensic Psychiatry Program
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: 905 522 1155 Ext. 39383
Fax: 905 381 5605
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

NORTH BAY REGIONAL HEALTH CENTRE
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Canada
Phone: 7054748600
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.Nagari Nandieshwar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nagari Nandieshwar ( CPSO# 102268)

Business Address:
Forensic Psychiatry Program
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2013 to 21 Nov 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 22 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Nov 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 04 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 Sep 2015
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Satyadev  Nagari  Nandieshwar  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            psychiatry, only.