Nagel, Michael Gerald (CPSO#: 84871)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Health Sciences Antigua, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4421 Queen Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 2L2
Phone: (905) 356-2236
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Nagel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nagel ( CPSO# 84871 )

Business Address:
4421 Queen Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 2L2
Phone Number: (905) 356-2236

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL GERALD NAGEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 28 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009