Naghi, Alexandru (CPSO#: 55887)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Physician Relations 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 28 May 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014