Nagi, Kirandeep Singh (CPSO#: 64958)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 409
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (289) 997-3264
Fax: (289) 997-3265
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kirandeep Nagi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nagi ( CPSO# 64958 )

Business Address:
Suite 409
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (289) 997-3264

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRANDEEP SINGH NAGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1993