Nagib, Samar Rashad (CPSO#: 68672)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Mar 1996
Resident 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 14 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 2 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1997