Naglie, Ian Gary (CPSO#: 52387)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest
3560 Bathurst Street
Kimel Family Building, Room 278
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500
Fax: (647) 788-1199
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN GARY NAGLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGLIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Aug 1989
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1985